Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J15 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
640 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 10/10/1960 | ||
641 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 08/10/1958 | ||
642 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 19/05/1958 | ||
643 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 07/12/1959 | ||
644 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 20/10/1958 | ||
645 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 01/08/1962 | ||
646 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 19/12/1960 | ||
647 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 13/04/1959 | ||
648 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1899 | 07/03/1960 | ||
649 | J15 | GER | Worsdell | 0-6-0 | 09/1899 | 14/12/1959 |