Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 537 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3463 Week
» 5201 Month
» 132644 Year
» 1798020 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/Y25
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1890
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
885   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1890 05/1922  
886   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1890 12/04/1960  
887   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1890 13/12/1958  
888   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1890 01/12/1958  
889   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1890 10/1935  
890   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 10/1890 02/1935  
891   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1890 01/1935  
892   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1890 05/1949  
893   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1890 08/1949  
894   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 11/1890 29/05/1948