Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 518 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3444 Week
» 5182 Month
» 132625 Year
» 1798001 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/Y36
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 10/1895
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
387   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1895 03/10/1960  
388   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1895 10/1940  
389   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1895 06/08/1962  
390   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1895 05/09/1962  
391   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1896 18/08/1957  
392   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1896 08/05/1958  
393   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1896 02/06/1960  
394   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 01/1896 10/09/1961  
395   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1896 04/12/1960  
396   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 02/1896 29/11/1954