Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 524 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3450 Week
» 5188 Month
» 132631 Year
» 1798007 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/Y87
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1922
Class J20

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1285   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 16/09/1962  
1286   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 16/09/1962  
1287   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 10/09/1961  
1288   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 22/08/1960  
1289   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 06/01/1960  
1290   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 12/01/1960  
1291   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1922 06/04/1962  
1292   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 01/1923 10/09/1961  
1293   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 01/1923 20/03/1961  
1294   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 01/1923 16/09/1962