Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1896 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Duke |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3272 | 1531 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 08/1896 | 03/1938 | |
3273 | 1532 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 11/1896 | 01/1939 | |
3274 | 1533 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 11/1896 | 10/1936 | |
3275 | 1534 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 11/1896 | 03/1939 | |
3276 | 1535 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 12/1896 | 03/1937 | |
3277 | 1536 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1897 | 04/1939 | |
3278 | 1537 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1897 | 06/1936 | |
3279 | 1538 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1897 | 10/02/1934 | |
3280 | 1539 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1897 | 08/1938 | |
3281 | 1540 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1897 | 17/06/1949 | |
3282 | 1541 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1897 | 02/06/1934 | |
3283 | 1542 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1897 | 08/12/1949 | |
3284 | 1543 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1897 | 11/1936 | |
3285 | 1544 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1897 | 05/1936 | |
3286 | 1545 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1897 | 05/1932 | |
3287 | 1546 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1897 | 22/11/1949 | |
3288 | 1547 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1897 | 01/1937 | |
3289 | 1548 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1897 | 12/1938 | |
3290 | 1549 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1897 | 10/1938 | |
3291 | 1550 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1897 | 05/1939 |