Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1898 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Duke |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3312 | 1682 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 10/1898 | 05/1932 | |
3313 | 1683 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1899 | 02/1937 | |
3314 | 1684 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1899 | 10/1937 | |
3315 | 1685 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1899 | 27/12/1950 | |
3316 | 1686 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1899 | 04/1931 | |
3317 | 1687 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 03/05/1951 | |
3318 | 1688 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 04/04/1946 | |
3319 | 1689 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 01/1937 | |
3320 | 1690 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 04/1936 | |
3321 | 1691 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 18/07/1949 | |
3322 | 1692 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1899 | 16/11/1934 | |
3323 | 1693 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1899 | 03/1936 | |
3324 | 1694 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1899 | 06/1931 | |
3325 | 1695 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1899 | 04/1938 | |
3326 | 1696 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1899 | 13/07/1951 | |
3327 | 1697 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1899 | 03/1931 | |
3328 | 1698 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1899 | 01/1939 | |
3329 | 1699 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1899 | 01/02/1949 | |
3330 | 1700 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1899 | 10/02/1934 | |
3331 | 1701 | Duke | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 08/1899 | 05/1932 |