Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Metro |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3591 | 1763 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 09/1899 | 05/1936 | |
3592 | 1764 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 09/1899 | 04/04/1949 | |
3593 | 1765 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 09/1899 | 11/1927 | |
3594 | 1766 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 10/1899 | 03/05/1947 | |
3595 | 1767 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 10/1899 | 20/01/1945 | |
3596 | 1768 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 10/1899 | 22/03/1945 | |
3597 | 1769 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 10/1899 | 30/08/1948 | |
3598 | 1770 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 10/1899 | 10/1936 | |
3599 | 1771 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 11/1899 | 17/10/1949 | |
3600 | 1772 | Metro | GWR | Dean | 2-4-0T | 11/1899 | 04/1942 |