Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Aberdare |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2641 | 1929 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 10/1901 | 29/09/1934 | |
2642 | 1930 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 10/1901 | 03/06/1939 | |
2643 | 1931 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 10/1901 | 26/07/1948 | |
2644 | 1932 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 10/1901 | 16/10/1935 | |
2645 | 1933 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 14/12/1935 | |
2646 | 1934 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 01/10/1934 | |
2647 | 1935 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 01/12/1934 | |
2648 | 1936 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 17/02/1944 | |
2649 | 1937 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 08/08/1946 | |
2650 | 1938 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 11/1901 | 30/05/1936 | |
2651 | 1939 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 12/1901 | 06/06/1949 | |
2652 | 1940 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 12/1901 | 24/08/1945 | |
2653 | 1941 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 12/1901 | 17/11/1934 | |
2654 | 1942 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 01/1902 | 20/01/1936 | |
2655 | 1943 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 01/1902 | 08/06/1949 | |
2656 | 1944 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 01/1902 | 27/03/1948 | |
2657 | 1945 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 01/1902 | 18/10/1946 | |
2658 | 1946 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 02/1902 | 03/11/1934 | |
2659 | 1947 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 02/1902 | 28/10/1935 | |
2660 | 1948 | Aberdare | GWR | Dean | 2-6-0 | 02/1902 | 12/01/1946 |