Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1902 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Bulldog |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3413 | 1970 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 12/1902 | 17/09/1947 | |
3414 | 1971 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 12/1902 | 04/1937 | |
3415 | 1972 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 01/1903 | 21/10/1949 | |
3416 | 1973 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 21/06/1949 | |
3417 | 1974 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 01/1930 | |
3418 | 1975 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 24/04/1948 | |
3419 | 1976 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 09/1935 | |
3420 | 1977 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 03/1935 | |
3421 | 1978 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 02/1903 | 07/1936 | |
3422 | 1979 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1903 | 02/1939 | |
3423 | 1980 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1903 | 08/11/1944 | |
3424 | 1981 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 03/1903 | 10/1936 | |
3425 | 1982 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 02/1939 | |
3426 | 1983 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 06/1937 | |
3427 | 1984 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 11/09/1947 | |
3428 | 1985 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 27/09/1948 | |
3429 | 1986 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1951 | |
3430 | 1987 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 30/11/1945 | |
3431 | 1988 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 19/06/1948 | |
3432 | 1989 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1903 | 03/1938 |