Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 9 Steam locomotives |
Class | Saint |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
172 | 2106 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1905 | 03/1935 | |
173 | 2107 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/1905 | 08/07/1933 | |
174 | 2108 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/1905 | 11/08/1933 | |
175 | 2109 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/1905 | 30/11/1944 | |
176 | 2110 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1905 | 02/01/1934 | |
177 | 2111 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1905 | 02/1935 | |
178 | 2112 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1905 | 09/08/1946 | |
179 | 2113 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1905 | 31/01/1951 | |
180 | 2114 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1905 | 17/05/1948 |