Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1906 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | Bulldog |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3701 | 2169 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1906 | 10/1938 | |
3702 | 2170 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1906 | 13/03/1936 | |
3703 | 2171 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 04/1906 | 08/1936 | |
3704 | 2172 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1906 | 10/1938 | |
3705 | 2173 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 05/1906 | 02/1937 | |
3706 | 2174 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 15/05/1936 | |
3707 | 2175 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 24/04/1948 | |
3708 | 2176 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 15/08/1949 | |
3709 | 2177 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 18/08/1949 | |
3710 | 2178 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 09/1937 | |
3711 | 2179 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 19/04/1948 | |
3712 | 2180 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 03/1936 | |
3713 | 2181 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 01/1939 | |
3714 | 2182 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 07/1906 | 05/1936 | |
3715 | 2183 | Bulldog | GWR | Dean | 4-4-0 | 06/1906 | 02/1938 |