Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1906 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Saint |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2901 | 2199 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 12/04/1933 | |
2902 | 2200 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 18/08/1949 | |
2903 | 2201 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 04/11/1949 | |
2904 | 2202 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 15/10/1932 | |
2905 | 2203 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 24/04/1948 | |
2906 | 2204 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 16/08/1952 | |
2907 | 2205 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 18/07/1933 | |
2908 | 2206 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 16/12/1950 | |
2909 | 2207 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 07/11/1931 | |
2910 | 2208 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1906 | 23/10/1931 |