Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Star |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4001 | 2229 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1907 | 06/01/1934 | |
4002 | 2230 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/1907 | 02/06/1933 | |
4003 | 2231 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1907 | 18/07/1951 | |
4004 | 2232 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1907 | 24/04/1948 | |
4005 | 2233 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1907 | 17/11/1934 | |
4006 | 2234 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1907 | 11/1932 | |
4007 | 2235 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 04/1907 | 03/09/1951 | |
4008 | 2236 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1907 | 06/1935 | |
4009 | 2237 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 18/05/1907 | 06/03/1950 | |
4010 | 2238 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 05/1907 | 01/11/1934 |