Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Star |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4031 | 2380 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/1910 | 11/06/1951 | |
4032 | 2381 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/11/1910 | 24/09/1951 | |
4033 | 2382 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1910 | 14/06/1951 | |
4034 | 2383 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1910 | 15/09/1952 | |
4035 | 2384 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1910 | 22/10/1951 | |
4036 | 2385 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 12/1910 | 11/03/1952 | |
4037 | 2386 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 30/12/1910 | 17/09/1962 | |
4038 | 2387 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 01/1911 | 28/04/1952 | |
4039 | 2388 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 02/1911 | 20/11/1950 | |
4040 | 2389 | Star | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 03/1911 | 05/06/1951 |