Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1911 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2831 | 2390 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/1911 | 12/01/1960 | |
2832 | 2391 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/1911 | 16/11/1959 | |
2833 | 2392 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/1911 | 06/03/1959 | |
2834 | 2393 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1911 | 05/11/1962 | |
2835 | 2394 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1911 | 17/05/1960 |