Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1911 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Saint |
Information | Works numbers 2426-2435 alloted but not carried. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2931 | 2426 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/1911 | 19/02/1951 | |
2932 | 2427 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 10/1911 | 05/06/1951 | |
2933 | 2428 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1911 | 19/01/1953 | |
2934 | 2429 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1911 | 25/06/1952 | |
2935 | 2430 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1911 | 13/12/1948 | |
2936 | 2431 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 11/1911 | 26/04/1951 | |
2937 | 2432 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 12/1911 | 22/06/1953 | |
2938 | 2433 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 12/1911 | 13/08/1952 | |
2939 | 2434 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 12/1911 | 06/12/1950 | |
2940 | 2435 | Saint | GWR | Churchward | 4-6-0 | 12/1911 | 17/01/1952 |