Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 42xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4202 | 2446 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 08/06/1964 | |
4203 | 2447 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 12/01/1961 | |
4204 | 2448 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 24/07/1964 | |
4205 | 2449 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 07/09/1964 | |
4206 | 2450 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 31/12/1959 | |
4207 | 2451 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 03/10/1961 | |
4208 | 2452 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 16/11/1959 | |
4209 | 2453 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 02/1912 | 16/06/1965 | |
4210 | 2454 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1912 | 16/06/1965 | |
4211 | 2455 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 03/1912 | 12/08/1959 | |
4212 | 2456 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 08/1912 | 15/06/1959 | |
4213 | 2457 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1912 | 22/01/1964 | |
4214 | 2458 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1912 | 14/05/1964 | |
4215 | 2459 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 09/1912 | 01/10/1959 | |
4216 | 2460 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1912 | 06/02/1965 | |
4217 | 2461 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1912 | 28/07/1959 | |
4218 | 2462 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 11/1912 | 05/10/1962 | |
4219 | 2463 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1912 | 28/09/1964 | |
4220 | 2464 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1912 | 26/11/1962 | |
4221 | 2465 | 42xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0T | 12/1912 | 10/09/1959 |