Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1921 |
For | 24 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6318 | 2818 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1921 | 05/01/1959 | |
6319 | 2819 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1921 | 26/08/1963 | |
6320 | 2820 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1921 | 20/11/1963 | |
6321 | 2821 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1921 | 19/03/1956 | |
6322 | 2822 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 02/1921 | 05/01/1959 | |
6323 | 2823 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 11/07/1960 | |
6324 | 2824 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 02/04/1962 | |
6325 | 2825 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 23/11/1959 | |
6326 | 2826 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 07/09/1964 | |
6327 | 2827 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 23/09/1963 | |
6328 | 2828 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 03/1921 | 19/01/1959 | |
6329 | 2829 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1921 | 19/10/1961 | |
6330 | 2830 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1921 | 21/09/1962 | |
6331 | 2831 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1921 | 20/04/1959 | |
6332 | 2832 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1921 | 16/09/1960 | |
6333 | 2833 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1921 | 24/10/1960 | |
6334 | 2834 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1921 | 06/04/1959 | |
6335 | 2835 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1921 | 02/07/1963 | |
6336 | 2836 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1921 | 05/04/1962 | |
6337 | 2837 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 06/07/1964 | |
6338 | 2838 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 15/06/1964 | |
6339 | 2839 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 31/07/1962 | |
6340 | 2840 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 13/07/1962 | |
6341 | 2841 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 13/11/1961 |