Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1925 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 43xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6362 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1925 | 01/09/1962 | ||
6363 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1925 | 07/09/1964 | ||
6364 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 05/1925 | 21/11/1964 | ||
6365 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1925 | 21/10/1963 | ||
6366 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1925 | 17/09/1962 | ||
6367 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1925 | 06/11/1964 | ||
6368 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1925 | 16/12/1963 | ||
6369 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 10/1925 | 11/02/1963 | ||
7320 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1925 | 06/11/1964 | ||
7321 | 43xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-6-0 | 04/1925 | 21/09/1962 |