Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1927 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | King |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6000 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/1927 | 04/12/1962 | ||
6001 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1927 | 06/09/1962 | ||
6002 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1927 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6003 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | ||
6004 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | ||
6005 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1927 | 20/11/1962 | ||
6006 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1928 | 15/02/1962 | ||
6007 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1928 | 05/03/1936 | ||
6008 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1928 | 19/06/1962 | ||
6009 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1928 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6010 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/1928 | 22/06/1962 | ||
6011 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/1928 | 18/12/1962 | ||
6012 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/1928 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6013 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/1928 | 19/06/1962 | ||
6014 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/1928 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6015 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/1928 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6016 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/1928 | 13/09/1962 | ||
6017 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/1928 | 24/07/1962 | ||
6018 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/1928 | 18/12/1962 | ||
6019 | King | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/1928 | 21/09/1962 |