Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1927 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 4575 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5505 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1927 | 27/05/1957 | ||
5506 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1927 | 12/05/1958 | ||
5507 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1927 | 18/08/1958 | ||
5508 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1927 | 26/12/1964 | ||
5509 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/1927 | 21/12/1961 | ||
5510 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 24/10/1960 | ||
5511 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 05/12/1961 | ||
5512 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 11/02/1957 | ||
5513 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 03/06/1957 | ||
5514 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 09/11/1960 | ||
5515 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 21/11/1961 | ||
5516 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 24/08/1961 | ||
5517 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 01/12/1958 | ||
5518 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1927 | 06/05/1964 | ||
5519 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 | ||
5520 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 17/09/1962 | ||
5521 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 05/04/1962 | ||
5522 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 20/03/1959 | ||
5523 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 | ||
5524 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1927 | 20/06/1960 |