Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1928 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 4575 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5525 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1928 | 17/09/1962 | ||
5526 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1928 | 08/06/1962 | ||
5527 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1928 | 20/06/1960 | ||
5528 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1928 | 16/11/1959 | ||
5529 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/1928 | 01/08/1960 | ||
5530 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 04/01/1960 | ||
5531 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 26/12/1964 | ||
5532 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 10/07/1962 | ||
5533 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 24/12/1959 | ||
5534 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 21/09/1960 | ||
5535 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/1928 | 20/06/1957 | ||
5536 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 13/12/1960 | ||
5537 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 17/08/1962 | ||
5538 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 19/10/1961 | ||
5539 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 13/04/1962 | ||
5540 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 15/08/1960 | ||
5541 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1928 | 10/07/1962 | ||
5542 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 12/12/1961 | ||
5543 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/1928 | 25/07/1960 | ||
5544 | 4575 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/1928 | 21/09/1962 |