Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1928 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 56xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6630 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 01/09/1962 | ||
6631 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 10/09/1963 | ||
6632 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 10/09/1963 | ||
6633 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 29/05/1965 | ||
6634 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 24/04/1964 | ||
6635 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6636 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 24/06/1963 | ||
6637 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1928 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6638 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6639 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 21/10/1963 | ||
6640 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | ||
6641 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | ||
6642 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 14/01/1963 | ||
6643 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 06/08/1965 | ||
6644 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 03/07/1965 | ||
6645 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 02/08/1962 | ||
6646 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 16/05/1964 | ||
6647 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 01/09/1962 | ||
6648 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 07/05/1965 | ||
6649 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1928 | 06/02/1965 |