Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 40 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 21210 Month
» 21210 Year
» 1686586 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/252
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1928
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 56xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6630   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 01/09/1962  
6631   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 10/09/1963  
6632   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 10/09/1963  
6633   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 29/05/1965  
6634   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 24/04/1964  
6635   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 15/06/1964  
6636   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 24/06/1963  
6637   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 15/06/1964  
6638   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 15/06/1964  
6639   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 21/10/1963  
6640   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 01/09/1962  
6641   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 01/09/1962  
6642   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 14/01/1963  
6643   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/08/1965  
6644   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 03/07/1965  
6645   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 02/08/1962  
6646   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 16/05/1964  
6647   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 01/09/1962  
6648   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 07/05/1965  
6649   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/02/1965