Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1929 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5101 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5102 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 14/03/1960 | ||
5103 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 23/12/1960 | ||
5104 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 09/11/1960 | ||
5105 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 16/10/1958 | ||
5106 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1929 | 14/03/1960 | ||
5107 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1929 | 30/07/1957 | ||
5108 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1929 | 04/07/1958 | ||
5109 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1929 | 24/06/1957 | ||
5110 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1929 | 05/12/1960 | ||
5150 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 21/02/1930 | 15/08/1960 | ||
5151 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/02/1930 | 17/08/1962 | ||
5152 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 26/02/1930 | 20/11/1963 | ||
5153 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/03/1930 | 21/11/1964 | ||
5154 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/03/1930 | 29/08/1963 | ||
5155 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/03/1930 | 25/01/1960 | ||
5156 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 15/03/1930 | 09/09/1958 | ||
5157 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 24/03/1930 | 28/07/1958 | ||
5158 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 26/03/1930 | 06/04/1961 | ||
5159 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 28/03/1930 | 16/04/1956 |