Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1930 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5160 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/11/1930 | 25/11/1958 | ||
5161 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 15/11/1930 | 25/04/1957 | ||
5162 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 21/11/1930 | 16/07/1958 | ||
5163 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/12/1930 | 02/11/1959 | ||
5164 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 21/11/1930 | 05/04/1963 | ||
5165 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/11/1930 | 10/02/1958 | ||
5166 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/1930 | 30/05/1961 | ||
5167 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 29/01/1962 | ||
5168 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 18/08/1958 | ||
5169 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 16/09/1960 | ||
5170 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 07/12/1959 | ||
5171 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 28/07/1958 | ||
5172 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 06/10/1958 | ||
5173 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 17/08/1962 | ||
5174 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/1930 | 14/11/1961 | ||
5175 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/1931 | 18/04/1961 | ||
5176 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/1931 | 10/01/1961 | ||
5177 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/1931 | 30/05/1961 | ||
5178 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/1931 | 14/03/1960 | ||
5179 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1931 | 21/07/1960 | ||
5180 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/1931 | 03/07/1962 | ||
5181 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 24/08/1962 | ||
5182 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 25/05/1962 | ||
5183 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 21/05/1962 | ||
5184 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 23/10/1964 | ||
5185 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 15/03/1960 | ||
5186 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 03/1931 | 10/08/1959 | ||
5187 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1931 | 14/05/1962 | ||
5188 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1931 | 19/07/1962 | ||
5189 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 04/1931 | 03/08/1959 |