Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1931 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4981 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/1930 | 03/10/1963 | ||
4982 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | ||
4983 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 28/12/1963 | ||
4984 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 21/09/1962 | ||
4985 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 28/09/1964 | ||
4986 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 11/05/1962 | ||
4987 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 09/04/1962 | ||
4988 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/1931 | 14/02/1964 | ||
4989 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 06/11/1964 | ||
4990 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 05/04/1962 | ||
4991 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 28/12/1963 | ||
4992 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 30/04/1965 | ||
4993 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 06/02/1965 | ||
4994 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 15/03/1963 | ||
4995 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/1931 | 08/06/1962 | ||
4996 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1931 | 30/09/1963 | ||
4997 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1931 | 30/10/1961 | ||
4998 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1931 | 22/10/1963 | ||
4999 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1931 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5900 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/1931 | 02/12/1963 |