Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1932 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5013 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/06/1932 | 04/07/1962 | ||
5014 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/07/1932 | 06/02/1965 | ||
5015 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/07/1932 | 25/04/1963 | ||
5016 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 09/07/1932 | 17/09/1962 | ||
5017 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/07/1932 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5018 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/07/1932 | 10/03/1964 | ||
5019 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/07/1932 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5020 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/08/1932 | 20/11/1962 | ||
5021 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 17/08/1932 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5022 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/08/1932 | 24/06/1963 |