Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1932 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5921 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/05/1933 | 08/01/1962 | ||
5922 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/05/1933 | 06/01/1964 | ||
5923 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/05/1933 | 02/12/1963 | ||
5924 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/05/1933 | 28/12/1963 | ||
5925 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/05/1933 | 15/10/1962 | ||
5926 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5927 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 02/06/1933 | 24/10/1964 | ||
5928 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 08/06/1933 | 11/05/1962 | ||
5929 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/06/1933 | 28/10/1963 | ||
5930 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5931 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/06/1933 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5932 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/06/1933 | 26/10/1965 | ||
5933 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/06/1933 | 06/08/1965 | ||
5934 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/06/1933 | 06/05/1964 | ||
5935 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/07/1933 | 15/05/1962 | ||
5936 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/07/1933 | 15/01/1965 | ||
5937 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/07/1933 | 13/11/1963 | ||
5938 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/07/1933 | 03/05/1963 | ||
5939 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1933 | 23/10/1964 | ||
5940 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/08/1933 | 21/09/1962 |