Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1933 |
For | 60 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8750 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/09/1933 | 07/05/1962 | ||
8751 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/10/1933 | 18/12/1962 | ||
8752 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/10/1933 | 29/01/1963 | ||
8753 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/10/1933 | 08/02/1962 | ||
8754 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/10/1933 | 10/11/1960 | ||
8755 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/10/1933 | 02/12/1957 | ||
8756 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/10/1933 | 15/10/1962 | ||
8757 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/10/1933 | 27/09/1962 | ||
8758 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/10/1933 | 19/01/1959 | ||
8759 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/10/1933 | 29/01/1963 | ||
8760 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/10/1933 | 08/01/1962 | ||
8761 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/10/1933 | 14/05/1962 | ||
8762 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 25/10/1933 | 09/08/1961 | ||
8763 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/10/1933 | 14/08/1962 | ||
8764 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/10/1933 | 21/05/1962 | ||
8765 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/12/1933 | 25/09/1962 | ||
8766 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/12/1933 | 23/07/1963 | ||
8767 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/12/1933 | 23/07/1966 | ||
8768 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/12/1933 | 28/09/1964 | ||
8769 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/12/1933 | 07/04/1961 | ||
8770 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1934 | 12/12/1962 | ||
8771 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1934 | 13/07/1962 | ||
8772 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1934 | 17/08/1961 | ||
8773 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1934 | 22/10/1962 | ||
8774 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1934 | 09/08/1961 | ||
8775 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/01/1934 | 20/12/1961 | ||
8776 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/01/1934 | 18/12/1962 | ||
8777 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/01/1934 | 27/04/1961 | ||
8778 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/01/1934 | 01/08/1960 | ||
8779 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/01/1934 | 09/02/1962 | ||
8780 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/01/1934 | 31/07/1962 | ||
8781 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/01/1934 | 13/11/1962 | ||
8782 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/01/1934 | 14/11/1961 | ||
8783 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/01/1934 | 06/06/1963 | ||
8784 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/01/1934 | 23/04/1962 | ||
8785 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/01/1934 | 16/12/1963 | ||
8786 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/01/1934 | 20/07/1963 | ||
8787 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/01/1934 | 16/08/1961 | ||
8788 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/01/1934 | 07/05/1962 | ||
8789 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1934 | 13/06/1961 | ||
8790 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/02/1934 | 15/05/1962 | ||
8791 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/02/1934 | 08/03/1963 | ||
8792 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/02/1934 | 06/02/1962 | ||
8793 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/03/1934 | 14/12/1964 | ||
8794 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/03/1934 | 20/07/1963 | ||
8795 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/03/1934 | 21/07/1965 | ||
8796 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/03/1934 | 27/04/1961 | ||
8797 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/03/1934 | 02/04/1962 | ||
8798 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/03/1934 | 13/06/1961 | ||
9701 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/09/1933 | 13/01/1961 | ||
9702 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/09/1933 | 07/05/1962 | ||
9703 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/09/1933 | 11/12/1961 | ||
9704 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/10/1933 | 02/12/1963 | ||
9705 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/10/1933 | 09/10/1961 | ||
9706 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/12/1933 | 13/11/1964 | ||
9707 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/11/1933 | 07/09/1964 | ||
9708 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/12/1933 | 29/01/1959 | ||
9709 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/12/1933 | 21/05/1962 | ||
9710 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/12/1933 | 09/10/1964 | ||
8700 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/03/1934 | 09/02/1962 |