Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1933 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5190 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/10/1934 | 05/09/1962 | ||
5191 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/10/1934 | 15/06/1964 | ||
5192 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 11/10/1934 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5193 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/10/1934 | 22/06/1962 | ||
5194 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/10/1934 | 18/04/1961 | ||
5195 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/10/1934 | 13/06/1961 | ||
5196 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 26/10/1934 | 24/12/1959 | ||
5197 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 25/10/1934 | 21/07/1960 | ||
5198 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/11/1934 | 20/06/1961 | ||
5199 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/11/1934 | 15/03/1963 |