Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1933 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1366 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1366 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/02/1934 | 26/01/1961 | ||
1367 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/02/1934 | 09/10/1964 | ||
1368 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/02/1934 | 09/10/1964 | ||
1369 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/02/1934 | 06/11/1964 | ||
1370 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/02/1934 | 18/01/1960 | ||
1371 | 1366 | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/02/1934 | 21/11/1960 |