Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1934 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 61xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6160 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6161 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6162 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 15/10/1935 | 07/03/1962 | ||
6163 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 18/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6164 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 21/10/1935 | 25/11/1963 | ||
6165 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 25/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | ||
6166 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 28/10/1935 | 19/01/1962 | ||
6167 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 31/10/1935 | 01/10/1965 | ||
6168 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/11/1935 | 15/03/1962 | ||
6169 | 61xx | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/11/1935 | 26/10/1965 |