Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1934 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5023 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/04/1934 | 11/02/1963 | ||
5024 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/04/1934 | 21/05/1962 | ||
5025 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/04/1934 | 13/11/1963 | ||
5026 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/04/1934 | 14/11/1964 | ||
5027 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/04/1934 | 20/11/1962 | ||
5028 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 17/05/1934 | 20/05/1960 | ||
5029 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 17/05/1934 | 28/12/1963 | ||
5030 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/05/1934 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5031 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 24/05/1934 | 22/10/1963 | ||
5032 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 25/05/1934 | 21/09/1962 |