Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1935 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | 54xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5420 | 54xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/11/1935 | 10/10/1963 | ||
5421 | 54xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/11/1935 | 12/09/1962 | ||
5422 | 54xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/11/1935 | 30/06/1960 | ||
5423 | 54xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/11/1935 | 01/06/1959 | ||
5424 | 54xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/12/1935 | 27/04/1959 |