Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1937 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3735 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/08/1937 | 10/09/1965 | ||
3736 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/09/1937 | 22/03/1963 | ||
3737 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/09/1937 | 01/09/1964 | ||
3738 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/09/1937 | 06/08/1965 | ||
3739 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/09/1937 | 19/10/1964 | ||
3740 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/09/1937 | 07/01/1959 | ||
3741 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/09/1937 | 01/09/1962 | ||
3742 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 25/09/1937 | 27/11/1964 | ||
3743 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/09/1937 | 15/05/1962 | ||
3744 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/10/1937 | 27/08/1966 | ||
3745 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | ||
3746 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/10/1937 | 06/07/1964 | ||
3747 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/10/1937 | 20/02/1965 | ||
3748 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/10/1937 | 06/05/1964 | ||
3749 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/10/1937 | 06/11/1965 | ||
3750 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/11/1937 | 01/09/1962 | ||
3751 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/11/1937 | 10/09/1965 | ||
3752 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/11/1937 | 06/07/1964 | ||
3753 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/11/1937 | 15/01/1965 | ||
3754 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/11/1937 | 13/11/1965 | ||
3755 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/11/1937 | 15/10/1962 | ||
3756 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/11/1937 | 22/03/1963 | ||
3757 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/12/1937 | 06/05/1964 | ||
3758 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/12/1937 | 07/03/1966 | ||
3759 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/12/1937 | 31/12/1965 | ||
3760 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1937 | 27/09/1962 | ||
3761 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1937 | 06/05/1964 | ||
3762 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1937 | 02/12/1963 | ||
3763 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1937 | 16/06/1965 | ||
3764 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1937 | 29/01/1963 | ||
3765 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 29/03/1938 | 17/07/1963 | ||
3766 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/04/1938 | 29/08/1963 | ||
3767 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/04/1938 | 01/10/1965 | ||
3768 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/04/1938 | 06/05/1964 | ||
3769 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/04/1938 | 30/10/1962 | ||
3770 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/05/1938 | 03/04/1965 | ||
3771 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/05/1938 | 29/01/1963 | ||
3772 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/05/1938 | 25/06/1965 | ||
3773 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 20/05/1938 | 23/10/1962 | ||
3774 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 26/05/1938 | 21/05/1962 | ||
3775 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/07/1938 | 31/12/1965 | ||
3776 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/07/1938 | 16/04/1966 | ||
3777 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/07/1938 | 02/12/1963 | ||
3778 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/07/1938 | 07/03/1964 | ||
3779 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 30/07/1938 | 02/12/1963 | ||
3780 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/08/1938 | 18/12/1962 | ||
3781 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/08/1938 | 19/08/1963 | ||
3782 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/08/1938 | 15/10/1966 | ||
3783 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/08/1938 | 01/09/1962 | ||
3784 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 22/08/1938 | 03/06/1965 |