Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1936 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 74xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7400 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 30/07/1936 | 30/06/1960 | ||
7401 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/08/1936 | 17/08/1959 | ||
7402 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/08/1936 | 04/07/1962 | ||
7403 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/08/1936 | 11/01/1964 | ||
7404 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/08/1936 | 15/06/1964 | ||
7405 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/08/1936 | 16/12/1963 | ||
7406 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/08/1936 | 05/03/1962 | ||
7407 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/08/1936 | 02/12/1963 | ||
7408 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 20/08/1936 | 21/08/1962 | ||
7409 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/08/1936 | 17/08/1961 | ||
7410 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/12/1936 | 12/01/1961 | ||
7411 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/12/1936 | 11/05/1959 | ||
7412 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/12/1936 | 02/07/1963 | ||
7413 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/12/1936 | 05/09/1964 | ||
7414 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/12/1936 | 05/09/1964 | ||
7415 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/12/1936 | 09/02/1959 | ||
7416 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/12/1936 | 19/01/1959 | ||
7417 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/01/1937 | 14/09/1961 | ||
7418 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/01/1937 | 05/09/1964 | ||
7419 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/01/1937 | 21/07/1960 | ||
7420 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/05/1937 | 29/07/1959 | ||
7421 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/05/1937 | 22/11/1961 | ||
7422 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/05/1937 | 05/03/1962 | ||
7423 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 15/05/1937 | 06/07/1964 | ||
7424 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/05/1937 | 26/09/1964 | ||
7425 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/06/1937 | 05/06/1962 | ||
7426 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/06/1937 | 02/07/1963 | ||
7427 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/06/1937 | 15/06/1964 | ||
7428 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/06/1937 | 05/10/1962 | ||
7429 | 74xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 16/06/1937 | 06/02/1961 |