Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1937 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Manor |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7800 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 19/01/1938 | 22/08/1964 | ||
7801 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/01/1938 | 18/07/1965 | ||
7802 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/01/1938 | 06/11/1965 | ||
7803 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 27/01/1938 | 17/04/1965 | ||
7804 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1938 | 10/09/1965 | ||
7805 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/03/1938 | 05/12/1964 | ||
7806 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/03/1938 | 07/11/1964 | ||
7807 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/03/1938 | 21/11/1964 | ||
7808 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/03/1938 | 31/12/1965 | ||
7809 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/04/1938 | 11/04/1963 | ||
7810 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/12/1938 | 26/09/1964 | ||
7811 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/12/1938 | 21/07/1965 | ||
7812 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/01/1939 | 06/11/1965 | ||
7813 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/01/1939 | 07/05/1965 | ||
7814 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/01/1939 | 10/09/1965 | ||
7815 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/01/1939 | 23/10/1964 | ||
7816 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/01/1939 | 18/11/1965 | ||
7817 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 30/01/1939 | 15/06/1964 | ||
7818 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1939 | 23/01/1965 | ||
7819 | Manor | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/02/1939 | 06/11/1965 |