Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1939 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4130 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 09/10/1939 | 06/07/1964 | ||
4131 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/10/1939 | 07/09/1964 | ||
4132 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 19/10/1939 | 24/07/1964 | ||
4133 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 24/10/1939 | 24/10/1964 | ||
4134 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 27/10/1939 | 13/05/1963 | ||
4135 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 31/10/1939 | 08/06/1964 | ||
4136 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/11/1939 | 15/06/1964 | ||
4137 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/11/1939 | 09/10/1964 | ||
4138 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 29/11/1939 | 03/07/1958 | ||
4139 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/12/1939 | 08/07/1958 |