Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1939 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5093 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 15/06/1939 | 30/09/1963 | ||
5094 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/06/1939 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5095 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/06/1939 | 16/08/1962 | ||
5096 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/06/1939 | 15/06/1964 | ||
5097 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/07/1939 | 08/03/1963 |