Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1942 |
For | 26 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4635 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/12/1942 | 16/07/1966 | ||
4636 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/12/1942 | 10/09/1965 | ||
4637 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/12/1942 | 06/05/1964 | ||
4638 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/12/1942 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4639 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 24/12/1942 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4640 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/12/1942 | 16/12/1963 | ||
4641 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/12/1942 | 21/05/1962 | ||
4642 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/01/1943 | 15/01/1964 | ||
4643 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/01/1943 | 30/04/1965 | ||
4644 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/01/1943 | 23/10/1963 | ||
4645 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/02/1943 | 06/11/1965 | ||
4646 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 28/02/1943 | 12/11/1966 | ||
4647 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/03/1943 | 23/10/1962 | ||
4648 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/03/1943 | 26/09/1964 | ||
4649 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/03/1943 | 07/09/1964 | ||
4650 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 06/04/1943 | 21/07/1965 | ||
4651 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 08/04/1943 | 13/09/1963 | ||
4652 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 13/04/1943 | 08/04/1964 | ||
4653 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/04/1943 | 06/11/1964 | ||
4654 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 23/04/1943 | 16/12/1963 | ||
4655 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/05/1943 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4656 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1943 | 08/12/1962 | ||
4657 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1943 | 06/07/1964 | ||
4658 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/06/1943 | 06/05/1964 | ||
4659 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/06/1943 | 06/05/1964 | ||
4660 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/06/1943 | 06/07/1964 |