Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1946 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4150 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/06/1947 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4151 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 12/06/1947 | 17/04/1965 | ||
4152 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 21/06/1947 | 13/09/1962 | ||
4153 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 26/06/1947 | 21/11/1964 | ||
4154 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 05/07/1947 | 02/10/1965 | ||
4155 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/08/1947 | 25/09/1965 | ||
4156 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 13/08/1947 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4157 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 18/08/1947 | 16/06/1965 | ||
4158 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 25/08/1947 | 19/06/1965 | ||
4159 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 10/09/1947 | 15/06/1964 |