Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1948 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5101 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4160 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 06/09/1948 | 03/06/1965 | ||
4161 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/09/1948 | 18/11/1965 | ||
4162 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 20/09/1948 | 11/07/1960 | ||
4163 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 24/09/1948 | 30/10/1962 | ||
4164 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 30/09/1948 | 18/01/1960 | ||
4165 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 08/10/1948 | 09/10/1965 | ||
4166 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 18/10/1948 | 15/06/1964 | ||
4167 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/10/1948 | 16/05/1964 | ||
4168 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 01/11/1948 | 02/10/1965 | ||
4169 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 16/11/1948 | 21/05/1965 | ||
4170 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/10/1949 | 16/09/1960 | ||
4171 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/10/1949 | 24/10/1964 | ||
4172 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 24/10/1949 | 16/01/1965 | ||
4173 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 28/10/1949 | 05/12/1964 | ||
4174 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/11/1949 | 15/06/1964 | ||
4175 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 07/11/1949 | 02/10/1965 | ||
4176 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 14/11/1949 | 09/10/1965 | ||
4177 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 22/11/1949 | 21/05/1965 | ||
4178 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 29/11/1949 | 25/09/1965 | ||
4179 | 5101 | GWR | Collett | 2-6-2T | 02/12/1949 | 27/02/1965 |