Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 692 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 5845 Week
» 99079 Month
» 559020 Year
» 4998457 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/373
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1948
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class 15xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1500   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 24/06/1949 02/12/1963  
1501   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 08/07/1949 17/01/1961  
1502   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 29/07/1949 17/01/1961  
1503   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 09/08/1949 02/12/1963  
1504   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 19/08/1949 02/05/1963  
1505   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 31/08/1949 16/05/1962  
1506   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 01/09/1949 02/12/1963  
1507   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 07/09/1949 02/12/1963  
1508   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 14/09/1949 12/09/1962  
1509   15xx GWR Hawksworth 0-6-0PT 22/09/1949 24/08/1959