Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1948 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6760 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/11/1948 | 02/12/1963 | ||
6761 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/11/1948 | 12/01/1961 | ||
6762 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 05/11/1948 | 26/03/1963 | ||
6763 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/11/1948 | 16/12/1963 | ||
6764 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/11/1948 | 02/12/1963 | ||
6765 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/12/1948 | 06/05/1964 | ||
6766 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1949 | 01/08/1960 | ||
6767 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1949 | 12/12/1962 | ||
6768 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1949 | 15/01/1964 | ||
6769 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 31/01/1949 | 02/12/1963 |