Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Modified Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7920 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 05/09/1950 | 03/06/1965 | ||
7921 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 12/09/1950 | 16/12/1963 | ||
7922 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 20/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | ||
7923 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 26/09/1950 | 03/06/1965 | ||
7924 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 29/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | ||
7925 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 09/10/1950 | 31/12/1965 | ||
7926 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 12/10/1950 | 26/12/1964 | ||
7927 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 24/10/1950 | 03/12/1965 | ||
7928 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 30/10/1950 | 08/03/1965 | ||
7929 | Modified Hall | GWR | Hawksworth | 4-6-0 | 02/11/1950 | 21/08/1965 |