Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
9673 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/02/1949 | 17/05/1960 | ||
9674 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/03/1949 | 08/04/1964 | ||
9675 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 10/03/1949 | 01/10/1965 | ||
9676 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/03/1949 | 16/06/1965 | ||
9677 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 18/03/1949 | 06/11/1964 | ||
9678 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/04/1949 | 16/06/1965 | ||
9679 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 11/04/1949 | 06/11/1964 | ||
9680 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 25/04/1949 | 31/12/1965 | ||
9681 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/05/1949 | 06/08/1965 | ||
9682 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 09/05/1949 | 06/08/1965 |