Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6770 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 17/10/1950 | 30/10/1962 | ||
6771 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 19/10/1950 | 24/03/1958 | ||
6772 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/11/1950 | 16/12/1963 | ||
6773 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 03/11/1950 | 05/10/1959 | ||
6774 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 14/11/1950 | 14/12/1959 | ||
6775 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 21/11/1950 | 01/08/1960 | ||
6776 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 27/11/1950 | 12/01/1961 | ||
6777 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 04/12/1950 | 06/05/1964 | ||
6778 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 07/12/1950 | 04/05/1962 | ||
6779 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/12/1950 | 22/06/1959 |