Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 37 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 855 Week
» 17806 Month
» 170759 Year
» 1836135 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/392
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1952
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 3 Tank

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
82000   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 04/04/1952 10/12/1966  
82001   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 18/04/1952 31/12/1965  
82002   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 28/04/1952 07/02/1964  
82003   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 02/05/1952 10/12/1966  
82004   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 14/05/1952 01/10/1965  
82005   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 16/05/1952 19/09/1965  
82006   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 27/05/1952 18/09/1966  
82007   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 30/05/1952 25/06/1964  
82008   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 05/06/1952 07/02/1964  
82009   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 13/06/1952 05/11/1966