Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 850 Week
» 17801 Month
» 170754 Year
» 1836130 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/393
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1952
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 3 Tank

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
82010   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 25/06/1952 24/04/1965  
82011   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 01/07/1952 30/08/1964  
82012   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 04/07/1952 31/05/1964  
82013   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 09/07/1952 14/06/1964  
82014   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 01/08/1952 31/05/1964  
82015   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 13/08/1952 06/12/1964  
82016   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 21/08/1952 25/04/1965  
82017   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 08/08/1952 25/04/1965  
82018   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 08/09/1952 10/07/1966  
82019   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 26/09/1952 09/07/1967